OK HB3388 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 31-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance
Pending: Senate Retirement and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance
Pending: Senate Retirement and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Insurance; creating the Oklahoma Out-of-Network Surprise Billing and Transparency Act; effective date.
Title
Insurance; creating the Oklahoma Out-of-Network Surprise Billing and Transparency Act; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Sneed [R] | Sen. Kim David [R] | Rep. Charles Ortega [R] | Rep. Mike Sanders [R] |
Rep. Lewis Moore [R] | Rep. Dustin Roberts [R] | Rep. Sean Roberts [R] | Rep. Charles McCall [R] |
Rep. Johnny Tadlock [D] | Rep. Avery Frix [R] | Rep. Tom Gann [R] | Rep. Justin Humphrey [R] |
Rep. Josh West [R] | Rep. Jeff Boatman [R] | Rep. Rusty Cornwell [R] | Rep. Dean Davis [R] |
Rep. Derrel Fincher [R] | Rep. Jim Grego [R] | Rep. David Hardin [R] | Rep. Ronny Johns [R] |
Rep. Thomas Marti [R] | Rep. Stan May [R] | Rep. Jim Olsen [R] | Rep. Daniel Pae [R] |
Rep. Logan Phillips [R] | Rep. Randy Randleman [R] | Rep. Cynthia Roe [R] | Rep. Lonnie Sims [R] |
Rep. Marilyn Stark [R] | Rep. Danny Sterling [R] | Rep. Tammy Townley [R] | Rep. Mark Vancuren [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance |
2020-03-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-16 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-03-11 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 3 |
2020-03-11 | House | Title stricken |
2020-03-11 | House | Amended |
2020-03-11 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) McCall, Stark, Grego, Vancuren, Phillips, Johns, Humphrey, Hardin (David), West (Josh), Roberts (Dustin), Fincher, Gann, Roberts (Sean), May, Ortega |
2020-03-11 | House | General Order |
2020-02-26 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Townley, Boatman, Roe, Pae, Sterling, Davis, Marti, Cornwell, Moore, Frix, Olsen, Sims, Randleman, Sanders, Tadlock |
2020-02-26 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Insurance Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Insurance |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Senator David (principal Senate author) |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Sneed |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |