OK HB3364 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-20 - Approved by Governor 05/20/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-20 - Approved by Governor 05/20/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Elections; removing obsolete language; providing for application processes for absentee ballots; effective date; emergency.
Title
Elections; removing obsolete language; providing for application processes for absentee ballots; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-16 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 75 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Rules: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 77 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 15 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 35) [FAIL]
2022-03-01 - House - House: Elections and Ethics Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Rules: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 77 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 15 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 35) [FAIL]
2022-03-01 - House - House: Elections and Ethics Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-20 | House | Approved by Governor 05/20/2022 |
2022-05-17 | House | Sent to Governor |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2022-05-17 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2022-05-16 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2022-05-16 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 75 Nays: 16 |
2022-05-16 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2022-04-28 | House | SA's received |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 8 |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Title restored |
2022-04-27 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules committee; CR filed |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2022-03-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-10 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2022-03-09 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-09 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 18 |
2022-03-09 | House | Title stricken |
2022-03-09 | House | Amended |
2022-03-09 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) CrosswhiteHader |
2022-03-09 | House | Considered |
2022-03-09 | House | Laid over |
2022-03-09 | House | Amended |
2022-03-09 | House | General Order |
2022-03-02 | House | Authored by Senator Haste (principal Senate author) |
2022-03-02 | House | CR; Do Pass Elections and Ethics Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | Second Reading referred to Elections and Ethics |
2022-02-07 | House | Authored by Representative Roberts (Eric) |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading |