OK HB3357 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-17 - Referred to Public Safety
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Firearms; deleting exception to certain prohibited act; emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firearms; deleting exception to certain prohibited act; emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-20 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 1 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-17HouseReferred to Public Safety
2020-02-17HouseWithdrawn from Judiciary Committee
2020-02-04HouseSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2020-02-03HouseAuthored by Representative Lowe
2020-02-03HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback