OK HB3349 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-26 - Becomes law without Governor's signature 05/25/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-26 - Becomes law without Governor's signature 05/25/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Public funds; creating the Statewide Recovery Fund; limiting appropriations and transfer authority, directing deposits of certain interest and income to certain fund; emergency.
Title
Public funds; creating the Statewide Recovery Fund; limiting appropriations and transfer authority, directing deposits of certain interest and income to certain fund; emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Charles McCall [R] | Sen. Greg Treat [R] | Rep. Kevin Wallace [R] | Rep. Kevin McDugle [R] |
Rep. Kevin West [R] | Rep. Logan Phillips [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-18 - Senate - Senate: authority, directing deposits of certain interest (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 79 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - House - House: TABLE AMENDMENT TO AMENDMENT (Y: 57 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 79 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - House - House: TABLE AMENDMENT TO AMENDMENT (Y: 57 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-26 | House | Becomes law without Governor's signature 05/25/2022 |
2022-05-18 | House | Sent to Governor |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2022-05-18 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2022-05-18 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 |
2022-05-18 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2022-05-18 | Senate | CCR read |
2022-05-18 | House | To Senate |
2022-05-18 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 5 |
2022-05-18 | House | CCR adopted |
2022-05-18 | House | Enacting clause restored |
2022-05-18 | House | Title restored |
2022-05-18 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) West (Kevin) |
2022-05-18 | House | CCR submitted |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Treat, Thompson, Hall, McCortney, Floyd |
2022-05-18 | House | HC's changed: Withdrawn from Conference Committee on Rules and naming Special Conference Committee on ARPA |
2022-05-09 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Rules |
2022-04-28 | House | SA's received |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 48 Nays: 0 |
2022-04-27 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2022-03-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-23 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2022-03-22 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-22 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 0 |
2022-03-22 | House | Title stricken |
2022-03-22 | House | Amended by floor substitute |
2022-03-22 | House | Adoption of the floor substitute rescinded |
2022-03-22 | House | Amended by floor substitute |
2022-03-22 | House | House Rule suspended |
2022-03-22 | House | Authored by Senator Treat (principal Senate author) |
2022-03-22 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Wallace, McDugle, Phillips |
2022-03-22 | House | General Order |
2022-03-03 | House | Emergency added |
2022-03-03 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2022-02-07 | House | Authored by Representative McCall |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading |