OK HB3347 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - Coauthored by Representative(s) Marti, Davis
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - Coauthored by Representative(s) Marti, Davis
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Student athletes; allowing compensation for use of a student athlete's name, image or likeness; effective date.
Title
Student athletes; allowing compensation for use of a student athlete's name, image or likeness; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Mickey Dollens [D] | Rep. Monroe Nichols [D] | Rep. Dean Davis [R] | Rep. Thomas Marti [R] |
Rep. Regina Goodwin [D] | Sen. Dave Rader [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - House - House: Higher Education and Career Tech Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Marti, Davis |
2020-02-27 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Higher Education and Career Tech Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Higher Education and Career Tech |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Dollens, Nichols |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |