OK HB3300 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Approved by Governor 04/10/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Approved by Governor 04/10/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Department of Human Services; creating the Breanne Bell Act; requiring signature of form notifying care staff of certain criminal penalties; effective date.
Title
Department of Human Services; creating the Breanne Bell Act; requiring signature of form notifying care staff of certain criminal penalties; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House: Health Services and Long-Term Care Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House: Health Services and Long-Term Care Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | House | Approved by Governor 04/10/2018 |
2018-04-04 | House | Sent to Governor |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2018-04-04 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2018-04-03 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 |
2018-04-03 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2018-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-26 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2018-02-20 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2018-02-20 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 0 |
2018-02-20 | House | General Order |
2018-02-14 | House | Authored by Senator Griffin (principal Senate author) |
2018-02-14 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health Services and Long-Term Care Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Health Services and Long-Term Care |
2018-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Wright |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 1430 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
43A | 10 | 113 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |