OK HB3260 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-25 - 2 CCR read
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-25 - 2 CCR read
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Game and fish; relating to the authority of the Wildlife Conservation Commission to declare open seasons and adopt rules; directing the Commission to study the feasibility of an open season on the Lesser Prairie-Chicken. Emergency.
Title
Game and fish; relating to the authority of the Wildlife Conservation Commission to declare open seasons and adopt rules; directing the Commission to study the feasibility of an open season on the Lesser Prairie-Chicken. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-24 - House - House: (Y: 81 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 69 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - House - House: Wildlife Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 69 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - House - House: Wildlife Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-25 | 2 CCR read | |
2010-05-24 | To Senate | |
2010-05-24 | Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 4 | |
2010-05-24 | 2 CCR adopted | |
2010-05-21 | 2 CCR submitted | |
2010-05-13 | Further conference granted, same conferees | |
2010-05-13 | CCR rejected, further conference requested, same conferees | |
2010-05-12 | Title restored | |
2010-05-12 | CCR submitted | |
2010-05-05 | HC's named: Blackwell, Richardson, Pruett, Smithson, Jordan | |
2010-05-03 | Conference granted, SCs named Marlatt, Schulz, Justice, Wyrick, Ellis | |
2010-04-29 | SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later | |
2010-04-26 | SA's received | |
2010-04-26 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-04-21 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-21 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | |
2010-04-21 | Senate Rule suspended | |
2010-04-21 | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute | |
2010-03-29 | Enacting clause stricken | |
2010-03-29 | Reported Do Pass as amended Tourism and Wildlife committee; CR filed | |
2010-03-25 | Reported Do Pass as amended Tourism and Wildlife committee; pending CR | |
2010-03-15 | Second Reading referred to Tourism and Wildlife | |
2010-03-10 | First Reading | |
2010-03-10 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-03-09 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-09 | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 69 Nays: 24; Ayes: 45 Nays: 50 | |
2010-03-09 | Title stricken | |
2010-03-09 | Amended | |
2010-03-09 | Authored by Senator Marlatt (principal Senate author) | |
2010-03-09 | General Order | |
2010-02-24 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Wildlife Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Wildlife | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Representative Blackwell | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
29 | 5 | 209 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 5 | 210 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 5 | 211 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 5 | 401 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 5 | 415 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |