OK HB3258 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Approved by Governor 05/16/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Approved by Governor 05/16/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Sex crimes; penalties for sodomy; modifying elements of certain crimes; effective date.
Title
Sex crimes; penalties for sodomy; modifying elements of certain crimes; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-11 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: Judiciary - Criminal Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: Judiciary - Criminal Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-16 | House | Approved by Governor 05/16/2022 |
2022-05-12 | House | Sent to Governor |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2022-05-12 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2022-05-11 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2022-05-11 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 0 |
2022-05-11 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2022-04-28 | House | SA's received |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Title restored |
2022-04-27 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Title stricken |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2022-03-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-10 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2022-03-09 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-09 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 0 |
2022-03-09 | House | Authored by Senator Haste (principal Senate author) |
2022-03-09 | House | General Order |
2022-03-02 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2022-02-21 | House | Referred to Judiciary - Criminal |
2022-02-21 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2022-02-07 | House | Authored by Representative Nollan |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading |