OK HB3251 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-22 - Approved by Governor 05/18/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Violent crimes; expanding scope of definition to include certain crimes; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Violent crimes; expanding scope of definition to include certain crimes; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-22HouseApproved by Governor 05/18/2020
2020-05-12HouseSent to Governor
2020-05-12SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2020-05-12HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2020-05-11HouseReferred for enrollment
2020-05-11SenateEngrossed measure signed, returned to House
2020-05-11SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 2
2020-05-11SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2020-05-11SenateDirect to Calendar
2020-05-11SenateWithdrawn from Public Safety committee
2020-04-06SenateSecond Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2020-03-11SenateCoauthored by Representative Brewer
2020-03-11SenateFirst Reading
2020-03-11HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2020-03-10HouseReferred for engrossment
2020-03-10HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0
2020-03-10HouseAuthored by Senator David (principal Senate author)
2020-03-10HouseGeneral Order
2020-02-20HouseCR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee
2020-02-04HouseSecond Reading referred to Public Safety
2020-02-03HouseAuthored by Representative Echols
2020-02-03HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback