OK HB3251 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-12 - Approved by Governor 05/12/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]

Summary

Public buildings and public works; Public Competitive Bidding Act of 1974; modifying notice and bids for contract in an emergency; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public buildings and public works; Public Competitive Bidding Act of 1974; modifying notice and bids for contract in an emergency; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-05-12HouseApproved by Governor 05/12/2014
2014-05-07HouseSent to Governor
2014-05-07SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2014-05-07HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2014-05-06HouseReferred for enrollment
2014-05-06HouseMeasure passed: Ayes: 67 Nays: 26
2014-05-06HouseSA's read, adopted
2014-04-23HouseSA's received
2014-04-23SenateEngrossed to House
2014-04-22SenateReferred for engrossment
2014-04-22SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 1
2014-04-22SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2014-03-31SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government committee; CR filed
2014-03-13SenateSecond Reading referred to General Government
2014-03-04SenateFirst Reading
2014-03-04HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2014-03-03HouseReferred for engrossment
2014-03-03HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 7
2014-03-03HouseGeneral Order
2014-02-24HouseAuthored by Senator Schulz (principal Senate author)
2014-02-24HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Government Modernization Committee
2014-02-04HouseSecond Reading referred to Government Modernization
2014-02-03HouseAuthored by Representative Jordan
2014-02-03HouseFirst Reading

Subjects


Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback