OK HB3241 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-29 - Approved by Governor 04/28/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-29 - Approved by Governor 04/28/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Public health and safety; directing the Oklahoma State Bureau of Narcotics and Dangerous Drugs Control to exchange certain records with other states. Effective date.
Title
Public health and safety; directing the Oklahoma State Bureau of Narcotics and Dangerous Drugs Control to exchange certain records with other states. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-29 | Approved by Governor 04/28/2010 | |
2010-04-26 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-26 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2010-04-22 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2010-04-21 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-04-21 | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House | |
2010-04-21 | Measure passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0 | |
2010-04-21 | General Order, Considered | |
2010-03-30 | coauthored by Pittman | |
2010-03-30 | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed | |
2010-03-29 | Pending coauthorship Representative(s) Pittman | |
2010-03-25 | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; pending CR | |
2010-03-15 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services | |
2010-03-10 | First Reading | |
2010-03-10 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-03-09 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-09 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 2 | |
2010-03-09 | Authored by Senator Sykes (principal Senate author) | |
2010-03-09 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Ritze | |
2010-03-09 | General Order | |
2010-02-25 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Representative Derby | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
63 | 2 | 204 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 321 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 332 | New Code | See Bill Text |