OK HB3238 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-17 - Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance
Pending: Senate Retirement and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-17 - Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance
Pending: Senate Retirement and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Insurance; defining term; providing that Health Savings Account funds may be used for certain medical procedures; specifying that certain expenditures shall be considered qualified expenses for certain purposes. Effective date.
Title
Insurance; defining term; providing that Health Savings Account funds may be used for certain medical procedures; specifying that certain expenditures shall be considered qualified expenses for certain purposes. Effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-17 | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance | |
2010-03-11 | First Reading | |
2010-03-11 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-03-10 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-10 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 5 | |
2010-03-10 | Amended | |
2010-03-10 | House Rule suspended | |
2010-03-10 | Authored by Senator Jolley (principal Senate author) | |
2010-03-10 | Coauthored by Representative(s) McAffrey | |
2010-03-10 | General Order | |
2010-02-24 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Public Health | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Representative Derby | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
36 | 305 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 6060 | 19 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |