OK HB3231 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - Approved by Governor 06/06/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Public finance; authorizing issuance of certain obligations by the Capitol Improvement Authority.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public finance; authorizing issuance of certain obligations by the Capitol Improvement Authority.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-27 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 26 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-05-25 - House - House: TABLE RECONSIDERAT ION (Y: 60 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2016-05-25 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 54 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2016-05-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 56 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-05-24 - House - House: Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 17 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-27HouseApproved by Governor 06/06/2016
2016-05-27HouseSent to Governor
2016-05-27SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2016-05-27HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2016-05-27HouseReferred for enrollment
2016-05-27SenateEngrossed measure signed, returned to House
2016-05-27SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 26 Nays: 17
2016-05-27SenateJCR adopted
2016-05-26SenateDirect to Calendar
2016-05-25SenateFirst Reading
2016-05-25HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2016-05-25HouseReferred for engrossment
2016-05-25HouseMotion to reconsider emergency tabled
2016-05-25HouseMotion to reconsider tabled
2016-05-25HouseNotice served to reconsider vote by Representative Sears
2016-05-25HouseEmergency failed: Ayes: 54 Nays: 34
2016-05-25HouseNotice served to reconsider vote by Representative Sears
2016-05-25HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 56 Nays: 38
2016-05-25HouseJCR adopted
2016-05-25HouseConsidered
2016-05-25HouseLaid over
2016-05-25HouseGeneral Order
2016-05-24HouseJCR; Do pass, amended by committee substitute Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget
2016-05-24HouseSecond Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget
2016-05-23HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Treat
2016-05-23HouseAuthored by Senator Jolley (principal Senate author)
2016-05-23HouseAuthored by Representative Sears, Casey
2016-05-23HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb3231&Session=1600
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20INT/hB/HB3231%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20FLR/HFLR/HB3231%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCS/HB3231%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCS/HB3231%20CSTEST.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20ENGR/hB/HB3231%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20ENR/hB/HB3231%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2015-16%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/House/HB3231_votes.htm
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2015-16%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/Senate/HB3231_votes.htm

Bill Comments

feedback