OK HB3217 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on May 16 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-26 - Motion expired
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Revenue and taxation; computer-assisted mass appraisal; documentary stamps; fees; effective date; emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revenue and taxation; computer-assisted mass appraisal; documentary stamps; fees; effective date; emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-24 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 20 N: 64 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [FAIL]
2016-05-17 - House - House: Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget: DO PASS (Y: 17 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-26HouseMotion expired
2016-05-24HouseNotice served to reconsider vote by Representative Johnson
2016-05-24HouseThird Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 20 Nays: 64
2016-05-24HouseJCR adopted
2016-05-24HouseGeneral Order
2016-05-20HouseJCR; Do Pass Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget
2016-05-17HouseSecond Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget
2016-05-16HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Treat
2016-05-16HouseAuthored by Senator Jolley (principal Senate author)
2016-05-16HouseAuthored by Representative Sears, Casey
2016-05-16HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback