OK HB3201 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Approved by Governor 05/28/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Approved by Governor 05/28/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Sunset; State Board of Veterinary Medical Examiners; re-creating Board; modifying termination date.
Title
Sunset; State Board of Veterinary Medical Examiners; re-creating Board; modifying termination date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-22 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - House: Administrative Rules, Government Oversight and Repealer committee meeting: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - House: Administrative Rules, Government Oversight and Repealer committee meeting: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-23 | House | Approved by Governor 05/28/2014 |
2014-05-22 | House | Sent to Governor |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2014-05-22 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2014-05-22 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 44 Nays: 1 |
2014-05-22 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2014-05-21 | Senate | CCR read |
2014-05-21 | House | To Senate |
2014-05-21 | House | Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0 |
2014-05-21 | House | Remove Senator Treat as principal Senate author and substitute with Senator Fields |
2014-05-21 | House | CCR adopted |
2014-05-19 | House | Title restored |
2014-05-19 | House | CCR submitted |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Treat, Justice, Boggs, Ballenger, Wyrick, Fields |
2014-04-30 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Administrative Rules, Government Oversight and Repealer |
2014-04-14 | House | SA's received |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 1 |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Title stricken |
2014-04-10 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2014-03-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-03-06 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-03-05 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-05 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0 |
2014-03-05 | House | General Order |
2014-02-13 | House | CR; Do Pass Administrative Rules, Government Oversight and Repealer Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Administrative Rules, Government Oversight and Repealer |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Senator Treat (principal Senate author) |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Blackwell |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |