OK HB3193 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-16 - Approved by Governor 04/16/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-16 - Approved by Governor 04/16/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Sunset; Oklahoma Strategic Military Planning Commission; re-creating Commission; modifying termination date.
Title
Sunset; Oklahoma Strategic Military Planning Commission; re-creating Commission; modifying termination date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - House: Administrative Rules, Government Oversight and Repealer Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - House: Administrative Rules, Government Oversight and Repealer Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-16 | House | Approved by Governor 04/16/2014 |
2014-04-14 | House | Sent to Governor |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2014-04-14 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2014-04-10 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 0 |
2014-04-10 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed |
2014-03-26 | Senate | coauthored by Boggs |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2014-03-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-03-06 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-03-05 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-05 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 0 |
2014-03-05 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Pittman |
2014-03-05 | House | General Order |
2014-02-20 | House | CR; Do Pass Administrative Rules, Government Oversight and Repealer Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Administrative Rules, Government Oversight and Repealer |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Senator Treat (principal Senate author) |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Blackwell |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |