OK HB3160 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - Approved by Governor 06/08/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - Approved by Governor 06/08/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Court costs and fees; granting courts authority to waive outstanding fines, costs and fees under certain circumstances; effective date.
Title
Court costs and fees; granting courts authority to waive outstanding fines, costs and fees under certain circumstances; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeffrey Hickman [R] | Sen. Ann Griffin [R] | Rep. Ben Sherrer [D] | Rep. Chuck Hoskin [D] |
Sen. Corey Brooks [R] | Sen. Anastasia Pittman [D] | Sen. Kevin Matthews [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-27 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-05-23 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 72 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 83 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-23 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 72 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 83 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-27 | House | Approved by Governor 06/08/2016 |
2016-05-27 | House | Sent to Governor |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2016-05-27 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2016-05-27 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 44 Nays: 2 |
2016-05-27 | Senate | CCR adopted, GCCA |
2016-05-23 | Senate | CCR read, GCCA |
2016-05-23 | House | To Senate |
2016-05-23 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 72 Nays: 18 |
2016-05-23 | House | CCR adopted |
2016-05-19 | House | Enacting clause restored |
2016-05-19 | House | Title restored |
2016-05-19 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Matthews, Pittman |
2016-05-19 | House | CCR submitted |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Conference granted, GCCA |
2016-05-03 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming GCCA |
2016-04-25 | House | SA's received |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 |
2016-04-21 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass as amended Appr/Sub-Public Safety and Judiciary sub-committee |
2016-03-30 | Senate | coauthored by Brooks |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Referred to Appr/Sub-Public Safety and Judiciary |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2016-03-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-03-14 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2016-03-10 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2016-03-10 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 10 |
2016-03-10 | House | Title stricken |
2016-03-10 | House | Amended |
2016-03-10 | House | Authored by Senator Griffin (principal Senate author) |
2016-03-10 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Sherrer, Hoskin |
2016-03-10 | House | General Order |
2016-02-18 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2016-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2016-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Hickman |
2016-02-01 | House | First Reading |