OK HB3158 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-18 - Approved by Governor 04/18/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-18 - Approved by Governor 04/18/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Corporation Commission; authorizing the Commission to take certain emergency action in emergency situations; emergency.
Title
Corporation Commission; authorizing the Commission to take certain emergency action in emergency situations; emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Ron Justice [R] | Rep. Jeffrey Hickman [R] | Rep. Richard Morrissette [D] | Rep. Jason Murphey [R] |
Rep. Seneca Scott [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-18 | House | Approved by Governor 04/18/2016 |
2016-04-12 | House | Sent to Governor |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2016-04-12 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2016-04-11 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 |
2016-04-11 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Energy committee; CR filed |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Energy |
2016-03-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-03-08 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2016-03-07 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2016-03-07 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0 |
2016-03-07 | House | Amended |
2016-03-07 | House | Authored by Senator Justice (principal Senate author) |
2016-03-07 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Morrissette, Scott, Murphey |
2016-03-07 | House | General Order |
2016-02-17 | House | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee |
2016-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2016-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Hickman |
2016-02-01 | House | First Reading |