OK HB3151 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by Governor 04/24/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by Governor 04/24/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Labor; Boiler and Pressure Vessel Safety Act; providing exemption to liability for certain circumstances; effective date.
Title
Labor; Boiler and Pressure Vessel Safety Act; providing exemption to liability for certain circumstances; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-17 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 34 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 64 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House: Banking and Business Committee: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 64 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House: Banking and Business Committee: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | House | Approved by Governor 04/24/2018 |
2018-04-18 | House | Sent to Governor |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2018-04-18 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2018-04-17 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 34 Nays: 8 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Business, Commerce and Tourism committee; CR filed |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2018-03-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-03-07 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2018-03-06 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-06 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 64 Nays: 14 |
2018-03-06 | House | General Order |
2018-02-27 | House | Authored by Senator Paxton (principal Senate author) |
2018-02-27 | House | CR; Do Pass Banking and Business Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Banking and Business |
2018-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Coody |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading |