OK HB3135 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Criminal procedure; modifying eligible offender definition; effective date.
Title
Criminal procedure; modifying eligible offender definition; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-20 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House: Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee: DO PASS (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House: Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee: DO PASS (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | House | Approved by Governor 04/25/2022 |
2022-04-21 | House | Sent to Governor |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2022-04-21 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2022-04-20 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Amendment restored bill to engrossed version |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Title restored |
2022-04-20 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Title stricken |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2022-03-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-09 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2022-03-08 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-08 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0 |
2022-03-08 | House | Authored by Senator Coleman (principal Senate author) |
2022-03-08 | House | General Order |
2022-02-17 | House | CR; Do Pass Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | Second Reading referred to Criminal Justice and Corrections |
2022-02-07 | House | Authored by Representative Kendrix |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading |