OK HB3134 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-20 - Second Reading referred to Public Safety
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

State government; modifying and adding certain definitions relating to forensic laboratories; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State government; modifying and adding certain definitions relating to forensic laboratories; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 79 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-20SenateSecond Reading referred to Public Safety
2018-03-07SenateFirst Reading
2018-03-07HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2018-03-06HouseReferred for engrossment
2018-03-06HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 1
2018-03-06HouseGeneral Order
2018-02-15HouseAuthored by Senator Brecheen (principal Senate author)
2018-02-15HouseCR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee
2018-02-06HouseSecond Reading referred to Public Safety
2018-02-05HouseAuthored by Representative Ritze
2018-02-05HouseFirst Reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7415037New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback