OK HB3134 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-20 - Second Reading referred to Public Safety
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-20 - Second Reading referred to Public Safety
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
State government; modifying and adding certain definitions relating to forensic laboratories; effective date.
Title
State government; modifying and adding certain definitions relating to forensic laboratories; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 79 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2018-03-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-03-07 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2018-03-06 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-06 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 1 |
2018-03-06 | House | General Order |
2018-02-15 | House | Authored by Senator Brecheen (principal Senate author) |
2018-02-15 | House | CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2018-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Ritze |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading |