OK HB3128 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Public health and safety; creating the Prenatal Nondiscrimination Act of 2016; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public health and safety; creating the Prenatal Nondiscrimination Act of 2016; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-19 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Senate: AMENDMENT (Y: 7 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2016-02-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 78 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-19HouseDied in conference
2016-04-27SenateConference granted, SCs named Treat, David, Bass, Standridge, Brooks, Griffin, Floyd
2016-04-25HouseSA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Public Health
2016-04-20HouseSA's received
2016-04-20SenateEngrossed to House
2016-04-19SenateReferred for engrossment
2016-04-19SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 6
2016-04-19SenateTitle stricken
2016-04-19SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2016-04-19SenateSenate Rule suspended
2016-04-04SenateReported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
2016-03-10SenateSecond Reading referred to Health and Human Services
2016-02-23SenateFirst Reading
2016-02-23HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2016-02-22HouseReferred for engrossment
2016-02-22HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 10
2016-02-22HouseAuthored by Senator Treat (principal Senate author)
2016-02-22HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Faught
2016-02-22HouseGeneral Order
2016-02-10HouseCR; Do Pass Public Health Committee
2016-02-02HouseSecond Reading referred to Public Health
2016-02-01HouseAuthored by Representative Cockroft
2016-02-01HouseFirst Reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
631731Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback