OK HB3123 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; modifying volunteer firefighter tax credit structure. Effective date.
Title
Revenue and taxation; modifying volunteer firefighter tax credit structure. Effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Dennis Bailey [D] | Rep. Lisa Billy [R] | Rep. Samson Buck [D] | Rep. Joe Dorman [D] |
Sen. Jay Gumm [D] | Sen. Tom Ivester [D] | Rep. Leslie Osborn [R] | Rep. Pat Ownbey [R] |
Rep. Brian Renegar [D] | Rep. Todd Russ [R] | Rep. Mike Sanders [R] | Sen. Mike Schulz [R] |
Rep. Glen Smithson [D] | Rep. Purcy Walker [D] | Rep. Paul Wesselhoft [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Revenue & Taxation: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Revenue & Taxation: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Died in conference | |
2010-04-28 | Conference granted, GCCA | |
2010-04-26 | SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later | |
2010-04-21 | SA's received | |
2010-04-21 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-04-20 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-20 | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 | |
2010-04-20 | General Order, Considered | |
2010-03-31 | coauthored by Buck, Wesselhoft, Walker | |
2010-03-31 | coauthored by Gumm, Ivester | |
2010-03-31 | Title stricken | |
2010-03-31 | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed | |
2010-03-30 | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; pending CR | |
2010-03-30 | Pending coauthorship Senator(s) Gumm, Ivester | |
2010-03-24 | Pending coauthorship Representative(s) Walker | |
2010-03-18 | Pending coauthorship Representative(s) Wesselhoft | |
2010-03-18 | Pending coauthorship Representative(s) Buck | |
2010-03-17 | Second Reading referred to Finance | |
2010-03-15 | First Reading | |
2010-03-15 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-03-11 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-11 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 0 | |
2010-03-11 | Title restored | |
2010-03-11 | Amended by floor substitute | |
2010-03-11 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Osborn, Smithson, Billy, Ownbey, Renegar, Bailey, Sanders, Russ | |
2010-03-11 | General Order | |
2010-02-25 | Title stricken | |
2010-02-25 | Authored by Senator Schulz (principal Senate author) | |
2010-02-25 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Representative Dorman | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |