OK HB3119 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - Approved by Governor 06/08/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - Approved by Governor 06/08/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Criminal procedure; Drug Court Act; authorizing the reduction or waiver of court costs, fees and fines under certain circumstances; effective date.
Title
Criminal procedure; Drug Court Act; authorizing the reduction or waiver of court costs, fees and fines under certain circumstances; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Martin [R] | Sen. Wayne Shaw [R] | Sen. Corey Brooks [R] | Rep. Regina Goodwin [D] |
Sen. Anastasia Pittman [D] | Sen. Kevin Matthews [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-25 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-05-19 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 57 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Judiciary Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-19 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 57 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Judiciary Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-27 | House | Approved by Governor 06/08/2016 |
2016-05-26 | House | Sent to Governor |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2016-05-26 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2016-05-25 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2016-05-25 | Senate | CCR adopted, GCCA |
2016-05-19 | Senate | coauthored by Goodwin |
2016-05-19 | Senate | CCR read, GCCA |
2016-05-19 | House | To Senate |
2016-05-19 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 57 Nays: 36 |
2016-05-19 | House | CCR adopted |
2016-05-18 | House | CCR submitted |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Conference granted, GCCA |
2016-04-25 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming GCCA |
2016-04-19 | House | SA's received |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Title restored |
2016-04-18 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2016-04-18 | Senate | coauthored by Matthews |
2016-04-18 | Senate | coauthored by Pittman |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Title stricken |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass as amended Appr/Sub-Public Safety and Judiciary sub-committee |
2016-03-30 | Senate | coauthored by Brooks |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Appr/Sub-Public Safety and Judiciary |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2016-03-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-03-03 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2016-03-02 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2016-03-02 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 5 |
2016-03-02 | House | General Order |
2016-02-25 | House | Authored by Senator Shaw (principal Senate author) |
2016-02-25 | House | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2016-02-22 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Judiciary Subcommittee |
2016-02-02 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Judiciary Subcommittee |
2016-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2016-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Martin |
2016-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22 | 471 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
22 | 471 | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |