OK HB3119 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-23 - CCR submitted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-23 - CCR submitted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Schools; deleting provision for payment of severance allowance from the School Consolidation Assistance Fund; effective date.
Title
Schools; deleting provision for payment of severance allowance from the School Consolidation Assistance Fund; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-16 - House - House: Conference Committee on Education: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 67 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 58 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 67 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 58 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-23 | CCR submitted | |
2012-05-07 | Conference granted, GCCA | |
2012-05-03 | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Education | |
2012-04-19 | SA's received | |
2012-04-18 | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-04-18 | Measure passed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 8 | |
2012-04-18 | Amendment restored bill to engrossed version | |
2012-04-18 | Title restored | |
2012-04-18 | General Order, Amended | |
2012-04-18 | Senate Rule suspended | |
2012-04-09 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2012-03-26 | Referred to Appropriations | |
2012-03-26 | Title stricken | |
2012-03-26 | Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed | |
2012-03-21 | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee | |
2012-03-19 | First Reading | |
2012-03-19 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-03-15 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-15 | Motion expired | |
2012-03-13 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Hickman | |
2012-03-13 | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 67 Nays: 22; Ayes: 58 Nays: 26 | |
2012-03-13 | General Order | |
2012-03-01 | Authored by Senator Stanislawski (principal Senate author) | |
2012-03-01 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee | |
2012-02-20 | Referred to Common Education Committee | |
2012-02-20 | Withdrawn from Rules Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Rules | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Representative Hickman | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |