OK HB3117 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-29 - Authored by Senator Anderson (principal Senate author)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-29 - Authored by Senator Anderson (principal Senate author)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Summary
Motor vehicles; providing Oklahoma Energy special license plate; effective date.
Title
Motor vehicles; providing Oklahoma Energy special license plate; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-28 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-29 | Authored by Senator Anderson (principal Senate author) | |
2012-02-29 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Transportation Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Transportation | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Representative Hickman | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |