OK HB3113 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-23 - Motion to suspend rule failed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-23 - Motion to suspend rule failed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; income tax; rates; effective date.
Title
Revenue and taxation; income tax; rates; effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | House | Motion to suspend rule failed |
2018-04-19 | House | Motion to suspend rule failed |
2018-04-18 | House | Motion to suspend rule failed |
2018-04-17 | House | Motion to suspend rule failed |
2018-04-16 | House | Motion to suspend rule failed |
2018-04-12 | House | Motion to suspend rule failed |
2018-04-11 | House | Motion to suspend rule failed |
2018-04-10 | House | Motion to suspend rule failed |
2018-04-09 | House | Motion to suspend rule failed |
2018-02-06 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee |
2018-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2018-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Proctor |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading |
Oklahoma State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb3113&Session=1800 |
Text | http://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20INT/hB/HB3113%20INT.PDF |