OK HB3104 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
Pending: Senate Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Professions and occupations; creating the Predatory Real Estate Wholesaler Prohibition Act; prohibiting certain contracts for sale of real property.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Professions and occupations; creating the Predatory Real Estate Wholesaler Prohibition Act; prohibiting certain contracts for sale of real property.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-06SenateSecond Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
2020-03-10SenateFirst Reading
2020-03-10HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2020-03-09HouseReferred for engrossment
2020-03-09HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 3
2020-03-09HouseTitle stricken
2020-03-09HouseAmended
2020-03-09HouseAuthored by Senator Rosino (principal Senate author)
2020-03-09HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Hill
2020-03-09HouseGeneral Order
2020-02-25HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee
2020-02-04HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2020-02-03HouseAuthored by Representative Osburn
2020-02-03HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback