OK HB3098 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 48-3)
Status: Failed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Firearms; deleting reference to the Self-Defense Act; deleting administrative penalty for certain prohibited act; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firearms; deleting reference to the Self-Defense Act; deleting administrative penalty for certain prohibited act; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-20 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 73 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - House - House: SHALL DECISION OF CHAIR BE DECISION OF HOUSE (Y: 64 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-19HouseDied in conference
2016-05-02SenateConference granted, SCs named Dahm, Justice, Sykes, Jolley, Griffin, Sparks, Floyd
2016-04-27HouseSA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Public Safety
2016-04-21HouseSA's received
2016-04-21SenateEngrossed to House
2016-04-20SenateReferred for engrossment
2016-04-20SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 9
2016-04-20SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2016-04-14Senatecoauthored by Shortey
2016-04-12Senatecoauthored by Silk
2016-04-06SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules committee; CR filed
2016-04-05SenateReferred to Rules
2016-04-04SenateWithdrawn from Public Safety Committee
2016-04-04SenateWithdrawn from Appropriations committee
2016-03-29SenateCoauthored by Brecheen
2016-03-29SenateRemove as author Senator Brecheen; authored by Dahm
2016-03-21SenateSecond Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2016-03-14SenateFirst Reading
2016-03-14HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2016-03-10HouseReferred for engrossment
2016-03-10HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 73 Nays: 15
2016-03-10HouseTitle stricken
2016-03-10HouseAmended
2016-03-10HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Walker, Jordan, Billy, Pfeiffer, Wesselhoft, Joyner, Christian, Scott, Rogers, Cleveland, Lockhart, Roberts (Dustin), Wallace, Sanders, Denney, Echols, Wood, Ownbey, Proctor, Russ, Wright, Strohm, McBride
2016-03-10HouseGeneral Order
2016-02-22HouseAuthored by Senator Brecheen (principal Senate author)
2016-02-22HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Park, Moore, Bennett, Ritze, Johnson, Murphey, Murdock, Leewright, Faught, Kannady, Brumbaugh, Montgomery, Kern, Cockroft, Fisher, McCall, Derby, Newell, Calvey, Roberts (Sean), ODonnell, Coody (Ann), Enns
2016-02-22HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee
2016-02-02HouseSecond Reading referred to Public Safety
2016-02-01HouseAuthored by Representative Coody (Jeff)
2016-02-01HouseFirst Reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2112721New CodeSee Bill Text
2112722New CodeSee Bill Text
2112801New CodeSee Bill Text
21128910New CodeSee Bill Text
21128911New CodeSee Bill Text
21128912New CodeSee Bill Text
21128913New CodeSee Bill Text
21128913ANew CodeSee Bill Text
21128916New CodeSee Bill Text
21128923New CodeSee Bill Text
21128924New CodeSee Bill Text
21128925New CodeSee Bill Text
2112893New CodeSee Bill Text
2112896New CodeSee Bill Text
2112897New CodeSee Bill Text
2112898New CodeSee Bill Text
2112899New CodeSee Bill Text
2112901New CodeSee Bill Text
21129012New CodeSee Bill Text
21129014New CodeSee Bill Text
21129015New CodeSee Bill Text
21129017New CodeSee Bill Text
21129018New CodeSee Bill Text
2112902New CodeSee Bill Text
21129021New CodeSee Bill Text
21129022New CodeSee Bill Text
21129024New CodeSee Bill Text
21129025New CodeSee Bill Text
21129026New CodeSee Bill Text
2112903New CodeSee Bill Text
2112904Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
2112905New CodeSee Bill Text
2112906Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
2112907New CodeSee Bill Text
2112908Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
5913502New CodeSee Bill Text
632110New CodeSee Bill Text
6342103New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb3098&Session=1600
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20INT/hB/HB3098%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCS/HB3098%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20FLR/HFLR/HB3098%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20ENGR/hB/HB3098%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20FLR/SFLR/HB3098%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCSH/HB3098%20SCSH.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/HB3098%20SAHB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2015-16%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/House/HB3098_votes.htm
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2015-16%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/Senate/HB3098_votes.htm

Bill Comments

feedback