OK HB3095 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
Pending: Senate Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
Pending: Senate Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicles; requiring certain employees to have certificates of registration; effective date.
Title
Motor vehicles; requiring certain employees to have certificates of registration; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House: Government Efficiency Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House: Government Efficiency Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2020-03-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-04 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-03-03 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-03 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0 |
2020-03-03 | House | Authored by Senator Bice (principal Senate author) |
2020-03-03 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Mize |
2020-03-03 | House | General Order |
2020-02-12 | House | CR; Do Pass Government Efficiency Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Government Efficiency |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Osburn |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |