OK HB3093 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-25 - Approved by Governor 05/30/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-25 - Approved by Governor 05/30/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Canoes; exempting canoes from registration and excise tax; subjecting canoes to sales tax; effective date.
Title
Canoes; exempting canoes from registration and excise tax; subjecting canoes to sales tax; effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Childers [R] | Sen. Eddie Fields [R] | Sen. Earl Garrison [D] | Rep. Curtis McDaniel [D] |
Sen. Anastasia Pittman [D] | Rep. Ben Sherrer [D] | Rep. Cory Williams [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-25 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-05-25 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-05-08 - House - House: General Conference Committee: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 55 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 34) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE TITLE (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Revenue & Taxation: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE TITLE (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-25 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-05-08 - House - House: General Conference Committee: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 55 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 34) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE TITLE (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Revenue & Taxation: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE TITLE (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-25 | Approved by Governor 05/30/2012 | |
2012-05-25 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-05-25 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-05-25 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2012-05-25 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-05-25 | Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 | |
2012-05-25 | coauthored by Childers | |
2012-05-25 | CCR adopted, GCCA | |
2012-05-25 | CCR read, GCCA | |
2012-05-25 | To Senate | |
2012-05-25 | Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 1 | |
2012-05-25 | CCR adopted | |
2012-05-23 | Enacting clause restored | |
2012-05-23 | Title restored | |
2012-05-23 | CCR submitted | |
2012-05-01 | Conference granted, GCCA | |
2012-04-25 | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming GCCA | |
2012-04-11 | SA's received | |
2012-04-11 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-04-10 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-04-10 | Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 0 | |
2012-04-10 | coauthored by Garrison | |
2012-04-10 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-03-28 | Enacting clause stricken | |
2012-03-28 | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed | |
2012-03-21 | Second Reading referred to Finance | |
2012-03-19 | First Reading | |
2012-03-19 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-03-15 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-15 | Motion expired | |
2012-03-15 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Williams | |
2012-03-15 | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 68 Nays: 0; Ayes: 55 Nays: 10 | |
2012-03-15 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Pittman, McDaniel (Curtis), Sherrer | |
2012-03-15 | General Order | |
2012-03-01 | Title stricken | |
2012-03-01 | Authored by Senator Fields (principal Senate author) | |
2012-03-01 | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Representative Williams | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |