OK HB3087 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-27 - Second Reading referred to Aeronautics and Transportation
Pending: Senate Aeronautics and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-27 - Second Reading referred to Aeronautics and Transportation
Pending: Senate Aeronautics and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicles; modifying source establishing certain rates; removing various rates and fees; effective date.
Title
Motor vehicles; modifying source establishing certain rates; removing various rates and fees; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Neil Hays [R] | Sen. David Bullard [R] | Rep. Chris Sneed [R] | Rep. Ross Ford [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 83 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Aeronautics and Transportation |
2024-03-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-03-18 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2024-03-14 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-14 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 5 |
2024-03-14 | House | Title stricken |
2024-03-14 | House | Amended |
2024-03-14 | House | Amended by floor substitute |
2024-03-14 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Sneed |
2024-03-14 | House | General Order |
2024-02-28 | House | Authored by Senator Bullard (principal Senate author) |
2024-02-28 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Ford |
2024-02-28 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Transportation Committee |
2024-02-15 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2024-02-15 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2024-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Hays |
2024-02-05 | House | First Reading |