OK HB3074 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - Second Reading referred to Public Safety
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - Second Reading referred to Public Safety
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Public health and safety; adding exception to certain prohibited act; effective date.
Title
Public health and safety; adding exception to certain prohibited act; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 76 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House: Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee: DO PASS (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House: Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee: DO PASS (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2022-03-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-23 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2022-03-22 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-22 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 12 |
2022-03-22 | House | Title stricken |
2022-03-22 | House | Amended |
2022-03-22 | House | General Order |
2022-02-17 | House | Authored by Senator Bergstrom (principal Senate author) |
2022-02-17 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Kerbs, Roberts (Sean) |
2022-02-17 | House | CR; Do Pass Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | Second Reading referred to Criminal Justice and Corrections |
2022-02-07 | House | Authored by Representative Culver |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading |