OK HB3074 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-25 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-25 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Liens; hospital liens; providing for lien when injured party asserts claim against insurer; effective date.
Title
Liens; hospital liens; providing for lien when injured party asserts claim against insurer; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Dorman [D] | Sen. Rob Johnson [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-25 | Approved by Governor 04/25/2012 | |
2012-04-19 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-04-19 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-04-19 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2012-04-18 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-04-18 | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-04-18 | Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 2 | |
2012-04-18 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-04-09 | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed | |
2012-03-15 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2012-03-13 | First Reading | |
2012-03-13 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-03-12 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-12 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 0 | |
2012-03-12 | General Order | |
2012-02-21 | Authored by Senator Johnson (Rob) (principal Senate author) | |
2012-02-21 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Representative Dorman | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |