OK HB3071 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-19 - Approved by Governor 04/19/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-19 - Approved by Governor 04/19/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Insurance; requiring mandated health insurance coverage also apply to the Employees Health Insurance Plan; effective date.
Title
Insurance; requiring mandated health insurance coverage also apply to the Employees Health Insurance Plan; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 34 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-19 | House | Approved by Governor 04/19/2016 |
2016-04-13 | House | Sent to Governor |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2016-04-13 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2016-04-12 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 34 Nays: 10 |
2016-04-12 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Insurance committee; CR filed |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Insurance |
2016-03-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-03-10 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2016-03-09 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2016-03-09 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 2 |
2016-03-09 | House | Authored by Senator Quinn (principal Senate author) |
2016-03-09 | House | General Order |
2016-02-29 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Insurance Committee |
2016-02-22 | House | Referred to Insurance |
2016-02-22 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2016-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2016-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Mulready |
2016-02-01 | House | First Reading |