OK HB3049 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by Governor 05/22/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by Governor 05/22/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Sex offenders; prohibiting certain sex offenders from residing with minor children; effective date.
Title
Sex offenders; prohibiting certain sex offenders from residing with minor children; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-05-14 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 75 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2012-05-08 - House - House: Conference Committee on Public Safety,: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-14 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 75 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2012-05-08 - House - House: Conference Committee on Public Safety,: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-22 | Approved by Governor 05/22/2012 | |
2012-05-18 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-05-18 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-05-18 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2012-05-17 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-05-17 | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 | |
2012-05-17 | coauthored by Branan | |
2012-05-17 | CCR adopted | |
2012-05-14 | CCR read | |
2012-05-14 | To Senate | |
2012-05-14 | Measure passed: Ayes: 75 Nays: 9 | |
2012-05-14 | CCR adopted | |
2012-05-09 | Title restored | |
2012-05-09 | CCR submitted | |
2012-05-02 | Conference granted, SCs named Griffin, Barrington, Marlatt, Brinkley, Eason McIntyre, Childers, Paddack | |
2012-04-26 | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Public Safety, Judiciary and Military Affairs | |
2012-04-25 | SA's received | |
2012-04-25 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-04-24 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-04-24 | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 | |
2012-04-24 | coauthored by Marlatt | |
2012-04-24 | Remove as author Senator Marlatt; authored by Senator Griffin | |
2012-04-24 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-04-03 | Title stricken | |
2012-04-03 | Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed | |
2012-03-21 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | |
2012-03-14 | First Reading | |
2012-03-14 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-03-13 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-13 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 4 | |
2012-03-13 | General Order | |
2012-02-28 | Authored by Senator Marlatt (principal Senate author) | |
2012-02-28 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Representative Sanders | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |