OK HB3035 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-28 - Laid over
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-28 - Laid over
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Executive entity consolidations; codification; recodification. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Executive entity consolidations; codification; recodification. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Benge [R] | Rep. Samson Buck [D] | Sen. Glenn Coffee [R] | Rep. Sue Tibbs [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-05-28 - House - House: ADVANCE (Y: 44 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2010-05-28 - House - House: PREV QUESTION (Y: 39 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2010-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 81 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2010-05-28 - House - House: PREV QUESTION (Y: 39 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2010-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 81 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Laid over | |
2010-05-28 | Considered | |
2010-05-28 | 2 CCR submitted | |
2010-05-28 | SCs named Coffee, Newberry, Jolley | |
2010-05-28 | Withdrawn from GCCA - referred to conference | |
2010-05-27 | HC's added: Miller, Jackson, Jones | |
2010-05-27 | HC's removed: Tibbs, Buck, Murphey, Moore, McCullough | |
2010-05-19 | Conference changed, bill referred to GCCA | |
2010-05-19 | Further conference granted | |
2010-05-18 | CCR rejected, further conference requested, same conferees | |
2010-05-13 | Enacting clause restored | |
2010-05-13 | CCR submitted | |
2010-05-05 | Conference granted, SCs named Coffee, Johnson (Mike), Laster | |
2010-05-04 | HC's named: Benge, Tibbs, Buck, Walker, Rousselot, Murphey, Moore, McCullough | |
2010-04-28 | SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later | |
2010-04-21 | SA's received | |
2010-04-21 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-04-20 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-20 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 | |
2010-04-20 | General Order, Amended | |
2010-03-29 | Enacting clause stricken | |
2010-03-29 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2010-03-25 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; pending CR | |
2010-03-17 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations | |
2010-03-11 | First Reading | |
2010-03-11 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-03-10 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-10 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 15 | |
2010-03-10 | Amended by floor substitute | |
2010-03-10 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Buck, Tibbs | |
2010-03-10 | General Order | |
2010-02-25 | Title stricken | |
2010-02-25 | Authored by Senator Coffee (principal Senate author) | |
2010-02-25 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Representative Benge | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 1150 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 1663 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
21 | 1168 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 1168 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 1501 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
25 | 1502 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
25 | 1502 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 1502 | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 1502 | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 1502 | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 1502 | 13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 1502 | 14 | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 1502 | 15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 1502 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 1502 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 1502 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 1502 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 1502 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 1502 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 1502 | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 1502 | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 1503 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
25 | 1504 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
25 | 1505 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
25 | 1505 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 1506 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
25 | 1506 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 1506 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 1506 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 1506 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 1506 | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 1507 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
25 | 1508 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
25 | 1601 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
25 | 1604 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
25 | 1704 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
25 | 1705 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
25 | 1706 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
25 | 1901 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
27A | 3 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
27A | 3 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
28 | 152 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
40 | 1 | 2 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47A | 1 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47A | 1 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47A | 1 | 103 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
56 | 1010 | 23 | New Code | See Bill Text |
56 | 198 | 11b | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 1000 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 1000 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 1000 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 34 | 30 | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 41 | 5t | New Code | See Bill Text |
73 | 98 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 10 | 3 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 10 | 5 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 1201 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
74 | 1202 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
74 | 1203 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
74 | 1205 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
74 | 1210 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
74 | 1226 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 5060 | 44 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 5062 | 23 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 840 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 840 | 5 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 879 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
74 | 9 | 21 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 9 | 23 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 9 | 27 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 9 | 33 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 9 | 34 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 952 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
74 | 953 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
74 | 954 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
74 | 955 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
82 | 1451 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
82 | 1452 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
82 | 1453 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
82 | 1454 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
82 | 1455 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
82 | 1456 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
82 | 1457 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
82 | 1458 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
82 | 1460 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
82 | 1461 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
82 | 1462 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
82 | 1462A | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
82 | 1462B | New Code | See Bill Text | |
82 | 1462C | New Code | See Bill Text | |
82 | 1463 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
82 | 1464 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
82 | 1465 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
82 | 1466 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
82 | 1467 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
82 | 1468 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
82 | 1469 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
82 | 1470 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
82 | 1471 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |