OK HB3025 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Gaming; creating the Task Force for the Study of Lottery and Gaming Revenues; defining scope of study. Emergency.
Title
Gaming; creating the Task Force for the Study of Lottery and Gaming Revenues; defining scope of study. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-09 - House - House: RECONSIDER (Y: 87 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 70 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - House - House: Economic Development and Financial Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 70 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - House - House: Economic Development and Financial Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Died in conference | |
2010-05-04 | HC's named: Benge, Shannon, Billy, Fields, Morgan, Carey | |
2010-05-03 | Conference granted, GCCA | |
2010-04-28 | SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later | |
2010-04-20 | SA's received | |
2010-04-20 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-04-19 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-19 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 5 | |
2010-04-19 | General Order, Considered | |
2010-03-24 | Title stricken | |
2010-03-24 | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed | |
2010-03-23 | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; pending CR | |
2010-03-15 | Second Reading referred to Finance | |
2010-03-10 | First Reading | |
2010-03-10 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-03-09 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-09 | Emergency passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 15 | |
2010-03-09 | Motion to reconsider adopted: Ayes: 87 Nays: 8 | |
2010-03-09 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Sullivan | |
2010-03-09 | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 70 Nays: 28; Ayes: 63 Nays: 35 | |
2010-03-09 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Fields | |
2010-03-09 | General Order | |
2010-02-25 | Emergency added | |
2010-02-25 | Authored by Senator Coffee (principal Senate author) | |
2010-02-25 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Economic Development and Financial Services Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Economic Development and Financial Services | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Representative Benge | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |