OK HB3019 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Approved by Governor 05/02/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Approved by Governor 05/02/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Medical marijuana; modifying and adding definitions; allowing clear containers; exit package at point of sale and transfers; effective date.
Title
Medical marijuana; modifying and adding definitions; allowing clear containers; exit package at point of sale and transfers; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Fetgatter [R] | Sen. James Leewright [R] | Rep. Kevin McDugle [R] | Rep. Dean Davis [R] |
Rep. John Talley [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 36 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business, Commerce And Tourism: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business, Commerce And Tourism: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-02 | House | Approved by Governor 05/02/2022 |
2022-04-28 | House | Sent to Governor |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2022-04-28 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2022-04-27 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 7 |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Amendment restored bill to engrossed version |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Title restored |
2022-04-27 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Title stricken |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2022-03-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-24 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2022-03-23 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-23 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 4 |
2022-03-23 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Talley, McDugle |
2022-03-23 | House | General Order |
2022-03-03 | House | Authored by Senator Leewright (principal Senate author) |
2022-03-03 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Davis |
2022-03-03 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | Second Reading referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances |
2022-02-07 | House | Authored by Representative Fetgatter |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading |