OK HB3013 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - Coauthored by Representative(s) Talley
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Abortion-inducing drugs; defining terms; trafficking drugs; exceptions; felony; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Abortion-inducing drugs; defining terms; trafficking drugs; exceptions; felony; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-02-14 - House - House: Judiciary - Criminal Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-15HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Talley
2024-02-15HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2024-02-06HouseSecond Reading referred to Judiciary - Criminal
2024-02-05HouseAuthored by Representative CrosswhiteHader, Olsen
2024-02-05HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb3013&Session=2400
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20INT/hB/HB3013%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCS/HB3013%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20FLR/HFLR/HB3013%20HFLR.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20COMMITTEE%20AMENDMENTS/House/HB3013%20FULLPCS1%20DENISE%20CROSSWHITEHADER-TJ.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB3013%20INT%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB3013%20FULLPCS1%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB3013%20CS%20BILLSUM.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB3013_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback