OK HB3010 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-11 - Coauthored by Senator Bullard
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-11 - Coauthored by Senator Bullard
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Firearms; modifying legislative findings for firearms; specifying persons authorized to carry firearms; effective date.
Title
Firearms; modifying legislative findings for firearms; specifying persons authorized to carry firearms; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Gann [R] | Sen. Marty Quinn [R] | Rep. Dustin Roberts [R] | Rep. Sean Roberts [R] |
Rep. Justin Humphrey [R] | Rep. Jay Steagall [R] | Sen. David Bullard [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 76 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-11 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bullard |
2020-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Steagall |
2020-03-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-16 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-03-11 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 16 |
2020-03-11 | House | Amended |
2020-03-11 | House | Authored by Senator Quinn (principal Senate author) |
2020-03-11 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Humphrey, Roberts (Dustin) |
2020-03-11 | House | General Order |
2020-02-20 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Roberts (Sean) |
2020-02-20 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee |
2020-02-12 | House | Referred to Public Safety |
2020-02-12 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Gann |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |