OK HB2999 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Administrative Procedures Act; modifying procedures and requirements related to individual proceedings; effective date.
Title
Administrative Procedures Act; modifying procedures and requirements related to individual proceedings; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House: Judiciary Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House: Judiciary Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-23 | House | Died in conference |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Crain, Sykes, Griffin, David, Sparks, Paddack |
2014-04-29 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Judiciary |
2014-04-21 | House | SA's received |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Title stricken |
2014-04-16 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2014-03-05 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-03-05 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-03-04 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-04 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0 |
2014-03-04 | House | Authored by Senator Crain (principal Senate author) |
2014-03-04 | House | General Order |
2014-02-24 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Stiles |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |