OK HB2991 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-25 - CCR read, GCCA
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]

Summary

Public health and safety; requiring State Department of Health to allow individuals to access certain certificates online; website requirements; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public health and safety; requiring State Department of Health to allow individuals to access certain certificates online; website requirements; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-05-25 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 88 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-05-16 - House - House: Conference Committee on Government Modernization: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - House: Government Modernization Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-25 CCR read, GCCA
2012-05-25 To Senate
2012-05-25 Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 2
2012-05-25 CCR adopted
2012-05-21 Title restored
2012-05-21 CCR submitted
2012-05-01 Conference granted, GCCA
2012-04-24 SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Government Modernization and Rules
2012-04-17 SA's received
2012-04-17 Engrossed to House
2012-04-16 Referred for engrossment
2012-04-16 Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
2012-04-16 General Order, Considered
2012-04-09 Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
2012-03-27 Referred to Appropriations
2012-03-27 Title stricken
2012-03-27 Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
2012-03-15 Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2012-03-12 First Reading
2012-03-12 Engrossed, signed, to Senate
2012-03-08 Referred for engrossment
2012-03-08 Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 1
2012-03-08 General Order
2012-02-23 Authored by Senator Treat (principal Senate author)
2012-02-23 CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Government Modernization Committee
2012-02-07 Second Reading referred to Government Modernization
2012-02-06 Authored by Representative Ritze
2012-02-06 First Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
623424Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback