OK HB2963 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-18 - Approved by Governor 04/18/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-18 - Approved by Governor 04/18/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Adoption; modifying provisions of the Oklahoma Adoption Code related to adoption expenses; effective date.
Title
Adoption; modifying provisions of the Oklahoma Adoption Code related to adoption expenses; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House: Judiciary and Civil Procedure Committee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House: Judiciary and Civil Procedure Committee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-18 | House | Approved by Governor 04/18/2016 |
2016-04-12 | House | Sent to Governor |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2016-04-12 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2016-04-11 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2016-04-11 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2016-03-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-03-08 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2016-03-07 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2016-03-07 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 0 |
2016-03-07 | House | General Order |
2016-02-24 | House | Authored by Senator Treat (principal Senate author) |
2016-02-24 | House | CR; Do Pass Judiciary and Civil Procedure Committee |
2016-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary and Civil Procedure |
2016-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Nelson, Rousselot |
2016-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 7505 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 7509 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |