OK HB2962 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-04 - Approved by Governor 05/04/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Insurance; requiring coverage for autistic disorders under certain circumstances; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance; requiring coverage for autistic disorders under certain circumstances; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-27 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 65 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - Senate - Senate: (Y: 36 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 76 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-04HouseApproved by Governor 05/04/2016
2016-04-28HouseSent to Governor
2016-04-28SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2016-04-28HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2016-04-27HouseReferred for enrollment
2016-04-27HouseFourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 65 Nays: 26
2016-04-27HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Morrissette
2016-04-27HouseRemove as coauthor Representative(s) Hall
2016-04-27HouseSA's read, adopted
2016-04-18HouseSA's received
2016-04-18SenateEngrossed to House
2016-04-14SenateReferred for engrossment
2016-04-14SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 5
2016-04-14SenateEnacting clause restored
2016-04-14SenateTitle restored
2016-04-14SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2016-04-14Senatecoauthored by Pittman
2016-04-07Senatecoauthored by Martin
2016-04-04Senatecoauthored by Dossett
2016-03-30SenateReported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
2016-03-30Senatecoauthored by Floyd
2016-03-28SenateReferred to Appropriations
2016-03-28SenateEnacting clause stricken
2016-03-28SenateReported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
2016-03-23SenateSecond Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2016-03-23Senatecoauthored by Bice
2016-03-22Senatecoauthored by Fields
2016-03-21Senatecoauthored by Brooks
2016-03-16Senatecoauthored by Matthews
2016-03-15Senatecoauthored by Crain
2016-03-15Senatecoauthored by Simpson
2016-03-14Senatecoauthored by David
2016-03-10SenateFirst Reading
2016-03-10HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2016-03-09HouseReferred for engrossment
2016-03-09HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 20
2016-03-09HouseTitle stricken
2016-03-09HouseAmended
2016-03-09HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Fisher, Munson, Christian, Echols, Nollan, Wood, Loring, Bennett, Renegar, Lepak, Hoskin
2016-03-09HouseGeneral Order
2016-02-29HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Boggs, Thompson, Bass
2016-02-29HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Condit, Perryman, Cleveland, McBride, Casey, Roberts (Dustin), Kirby, Virgin, Rousselot, Cooksey, Lockhart, Cannaday, Stone, Murdock, Inman, Hall, Shelton, Griffith, Ownbey, Vaughan, Wallace
2016-02-29HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Insurance Committee
2016-02-02HouseSecond Reading referred to Insurance
2016-02-01HouseAuthored by Senator Griffin (principal Senate author)
2016-02-01HouseAuthored by Representative Nelson, Denney, Kannady, Dunnington, Henke, Montgomery, Sherrer, McDaniel (Jeannie), Brown, Kouplen
2016-02-01HouseFirst Reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
36606020New CodeSee Bill Text
36606021Amended CodeSee Bill Text
36606022Amended CodeSee Bill Text
56101112Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb2962&Session=1600
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20INT/hB/HB2962%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20FLR/HFLR/HB2962%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCS/HB2962%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20ENGR/hB/HB2962%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20FLR/SFLR/HB2962%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/HB2962%20SAHB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20ENR/hB/HB2962%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2015-16%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/House/HB2962_votes.htm
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2015-16%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/Senate/HB2962_votes.htm

Bill Comments

feedback