OK HB2957 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-10 - Approved by Governor 05/06/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-10 - Approved by Governor 05/06/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Motor vehicles; prohibiting public transit drivers from using certain devices while operating motor vehicles; exempting railroad employees. Effective date.
Title
Motor vehicles; prohibiting public transit drivers from using certain devices while operating motor vehicles; exempting railroad employees. Effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Nelson [R] | Sen. Mike Schulz [R] | Rep. Ben Sherrer [D] | Sen. Jabar Shumate [D] |
Rep. Sue Tibbs [R] | Rep. Harold Wright [R] | Rep. Harold Wright [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-05-03 - House - House: (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-10 | Approved by Governor 05/06/2010 | |
2010-05-04 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-05-04 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2010-05-04 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2010-05-03 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-05-03 | Measure passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 1 | |
2010-05-03 | SA's read, adopted | |
2010-04-07 | SA's received | |
2010-04-07 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-04-06 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-06 | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 | |
2010-04-06 | General Order, Amended | |
2010-03-17 | Reported Do Pass Public Safety and Homeland Security committee; CR filed | |
2010-03-16 | Reported Do Pass Public Safety and Homeland Security committee; pending CR | |
2010-03-08 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety and Homeland Security | |
2010-03-04 | First Reading | |
2010-03-04 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-03-03 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-03 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 2 | |
2010-03-03 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Tibbs, Nelson, Sherrer, Shumate | |
2010-03-03 | General Order | |
2010-02-25 | Authored by Senator Schulz (principal Senate author) | |
2010-02-25 | CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Representative Wright (Harold) | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |