OK HB2952 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - Motion expired
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - Motion expired
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Summary
Counties and county officers; training programs; authorizing Cooperative Extension Service to establish examination and accreditation system for certain persons; effective date.
Title
Counties and county officers; training programs; authorizing Cooperative Extension Service to establish examination and accreditation system for certain persons; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-26 - House - House: General Government Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | House | Motion expired |
2014-03-11 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Quinn |
2014-03-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 34 Nays: 59 |
2014-03-11 | House | General Order |
2014-02-27 | House | Authored by Senator Burrage (principal Senate author) |
2014-02-27 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Quinn |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |