OK HB2934 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-11 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-11 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Sex offenders; expanding information collected from sex offenders. Effective date.
Title
Sex offenders; expanding information collected from sex offenders. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-04 - House - House: (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-11 | Approved by Governor 05/10/2010 | |
2010-05-05 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-05-05 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2010-05-05 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2010-05-04 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-05-04 | Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0 | |
2010-05-04 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Johnson | |
2010-05-04 | SA's read, adopted | |
2010-04-07 | SA's received | |
2010-04-07 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-04-06 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-06 | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0 | |
2010-04-06 | coauthored by Gumm, Leftwich | |
2010-04-06 | Senate Rule suspended | |
2010-04-06 | General Order, Amended | |
2010-03-25 | coauthored by Pittman, Wesselhoft | |
2010-03-25 | coauthored by Paddack, Sykes | |
2010-03-25 | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed | |
2010-03-23 | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; pending CR | |
2010-03-23 | Pending coauthorship Senator(s) Sykes, Paddack | |
2010-03-16 | Pending coauthorship Representative(s) Pittman | |
2010-03-09 | Pending coauthorship Representative(s) Wesselhoft | |
2010-03-08 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2010-02-24 | First Reading | |
2010-02-24 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-02-23 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-02-23 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 100 Nays: 0 | |
2010-02-23 | Amended by floor substitute | |
2010-02-23 | Coauthored by Senator(s) Stanislawski | |
2010-02-23 | Authored by Senator Anderson (principal Senate author) | |
2010-02-23 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Duncan, Smithson, Cannaday, Walker | |
2010-02-23 | General Order | |
2010-02-09 | CR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Representative Luttrell | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22 | 991a | New Code | See Bill Text | |
57 | 584 | New Code | See Bill Text |