OK HB2932 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-17 - Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance
Pending: Senate Retirement and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-17 - Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance
Pending: Senate Retirement and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Public retirement systems; relating to the Teachers' Retirement System of Oklahoma; clarifying terminology. Effective date.
Title
Public retirement systems; relating to the Teachers' Retirement System of Oklahoma; clarifying terminology. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2010-03-11 - House - House: TABLE AMENDMENT (Y: 10 N: 64 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [FAIL]
2010-03-11 - House - House: TABLE AMENDMENT (Y: 10 N: 64 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-17 | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance | |
2010-03-15 | First Reading | |
2010-03-15 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-03-11 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-11 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 4 | |
2010-03-11 | Emergency removed | |
2010-03-11 | Amended by floor substitute | |
2010-03-11 | Authored by Senator Ford (principal Senate author) | |
2010-03-11 | Coauthored by Representative(s) McDaniel (Jeannie), Cannaday | |
2010-03-11 | General Order | |
2010-02-25 | Title stricken | |
2010-02-25 | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Representative Coody | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |